ID H0241 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 15, 2021 Session Law Chapter 236 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MOTOR VEHICLES -- Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding the installation of an ignition interlock device, to provide for a petition for relief in certain instances, and to revise provisions regarding judicial review.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding the installation of an ignition interlock device, to provide for a petition for relief in certain instances, and to revise provisions regarding judicial review.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 15, 2021 Session Law Chapter 236 Effective: 07/01/2021
2021-04-14HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on April 13, 2021
2021-04-13HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2021-04-12SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2021-04-12SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2021-04-09HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2021-04-09HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2021-04-08Senateto House
2021-04-08SenateTitle apvd
2021-04-08SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 21-13-1
2021-03-19SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-03-18SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2021-03-04SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2021-03-03Houseto Senate
2021-03-03HouseTitle apvd
2021-03-03HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3
2021-03-03HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-03-02HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-03-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-02-26HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-02-25HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback