ID H0240 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
COMMUNITY REENTRY CENTERS -- Adds to existing law to provide that the Department of Correction shall apply for a special use permit when establishing a new community reentry center.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that the Department of Correction shall apply for a special use permit when establishing a new community reentry center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-03-10 | House | to Senate |
2021-03-10 | House | Title apvd |
2021-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2021-03-10 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2021-03-08 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2021-03-08 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2021-03-08 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2021-02-25 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |