ID H0232 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2015 Session Law Chapter 166 Effective: 03/26/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2015 Session Law Chapter 166 Effective: 03/26/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - H&W, CHILDREN'S MENTAL HEALTH AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE TREATMENT - Changes the fiscal year 2015 appropriation to the Department of Health and Welfare with a one-time transfer of General Funds from Adult Mental Health to Children's Mental Health; changes the fiscal year 2015 appropriation for the Substance Abuse Treatment and Prevention Program with the transfer of 2.0 FTP from the Southwest Idaho Treatment Center and provides an additional appropriation of $796,700 from federal funds.
Title
Changes the fiscal year 2015 appropriation to the Department of Health and Welfare with a one-time transfer of General Funds from Adult Mental Health to Children's Mental Health; changes the fiscal year 2015 appropriation for the Substance Abuse Treatment and Prevention Program with the transfer of 2.0 FTP from the Southwest Idaho Treatment Center and provides an additional appropriation of $796,700 from federal funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2015 Session Law Chapter 166 Effective: 03/26/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-19 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-18 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-03-09 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-09 | House | Malek |
2015-03-09 | House | 58-11-1 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, DeMordaunt, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Collins, Crane, Dayley, Dixon, McMillan, Mendive, Nate, Shepherd, Sims, Vander Woude Absent -- Horman Floor Sponsor |
2015-03-09 | House | PASSED |
2015-03-09 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 66 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 4, read three times |
2015-03-09 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |