ID H0231 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 13, 2021 Session Law Chapter 208 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the independent candidate filing deadline for president or vice president.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the independent candidate filing deadline for president or vice president.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 13, 2021 Session Law Chapter 208 Effective: 07/01/2021
2021-04-13HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:27 a.m. on April 12, 2021
2021-04-12HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2021-04-09SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2021-04-09SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2021-04-08HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2021-04-08HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2021-04-07Senateto House
2021-04-07SenateTitle apvd
2021-04-07SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2021-03-16SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-03-15SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-03-09SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2021-03-09SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2021-03-08Houseto Senate
2021-03-08HouseTitle apvd
2021-03-08HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2021-03-08HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-03-05HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-03-04HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-02-24HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2021-02-23HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback