ID H0229 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
Pending: Senate Commerce and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

ELECTRICAL OCCUPATIONS -- Amends existing law to provide for the adoption of the Idaho Residential Electrical Code, to provide for rulemaking, and to provide for supervision of electrical apprentices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for the adoption of the Idaho Residential Electrical Code, to provide for rulemaking, and to provide for supervision of electrical apprentices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
2019-03-21SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-20Houseto Senate
2019-03-20HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-20HouseRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 45-24-1
2019-03-19HouseRead second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-18HouseRead first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
2019-03-18HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2019-03-15HouseBill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2019-03-15HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2019-03-15HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2019-03-15HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-14HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2019-03-12HouseU.C. to be returned to Business Committee
2019-03-12HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2019-03-06HouseReported Printed and Referred to Business
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback