ID H0226 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- OFFICE OF THE STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION -- Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2021-03-02Housemotion failed
2021-03-02HouseMotion to reconsider
2021-03-02HouseHeld at Desk
2021-03-02HouseNotice to reconsider
2021-03-02HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2021-03-02HousePreviously Read in Full -- FAILED 34-36-0
2021-03-02HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-03-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-03-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 1, 2021
2021-02-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-02-25HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-02-24HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2021-02-23HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback