ID H0226 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- OFFICE OF THE STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION -- Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2019-03-07HouseRead Third Time in Full -- FAILED 29-41-0
2019-03-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-05HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-04HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback