ID H0224 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2015 Session Law Chapter 148 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2015 Session Law Chapter 148 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - MEDICAL BOARDS - Appropriates $5,534,000 to the Medical Boards for fiscal year 2016; and limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 45.1.
Title
Appropriates $5,534,000 to the Medical Boards for fiscal year 2016; and limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 45.1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2015 Session Law Chapter 148 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:17 a.m. on March 23, 2015 |
2015-03-23 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-18 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-03-17 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-17 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-03-09 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-09 | House | King |
2015-03-09 | House | 57-12-1 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Burtenshaw, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hartgen, Holtzclaw, Jordan, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Boyle, Chaney, Harris, Hixon, Kerby, McMillan, Nate, Nielsen, Scott, Shepherd, Sims Absent -- Horman Floor Sponsor |
2015-03-09 | House | PASSED |
2015-03-09 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2015-03-09 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |