ID H0223 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ELECTIONS -- Adds to existing law to prohibit certain ballot collection activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to prohibit certain ballot collection activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2021-02-26SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2021-02-26SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2021-02-25Houseto Senate
2021-02-25HouseTitle apvd
2021-02-25HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 56-12-2
2021-02-25HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-02-24HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-02-24HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-02-23HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2021-02-22HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback