ID H0220 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BARBERING AND COSMETOLOGY -- Amends existing law to provide that a licensee may practice event styling or demonstrate the use of thermal styling equipment away from a licensed presence.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a licensee may practice event styling or demonstrate the use of thermal styling equipment away from a licensed presence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-10 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-10 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-10 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-3-1 |
2017-03-09 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |