ID H0214 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 6, 2015 Session Law Chapter 284 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SUNSHINE LAW - Amends existing law to revise the definition of "nonbusiness entity"; to revise expenditure requirements by nonbusiness entities; and to revise certain duties of lobbyists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise the definition of "nonbusiness entity"; to revise expenditure requirements by nonbusiness entities; and to revise certain duties of lobbyists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-06HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 6, 2015 Session Law Chapter 284 Effective: 07/01/2015
2015-04-02HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on April 1, 2015
2015-04-01HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2015-03-31SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2015-03-31SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2015-03-31HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2015-03-31HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2015-03-30Senateto House
2015-03-30SenateTitle apvd
2015-03-30SenateSiddoway
2015-03-30Senate34-0-1 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Cameron, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- McKenzie Floor Sponsor
2015-03-30SenatePASSED
2015-03-30SenateRead in full as required)
2015-03-30SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2015-03-30SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2015-03-13SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2015-03-13SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2015-03-12Houseto Senate
2015-03-12HouseTitle apvd
2015-03-12HousePASSED -- 69-0-1
2015-03-12HouseRead Third Time in Full
2015-03-11HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2015-03-10HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2015-03-09HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2015-03-03HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2015-03-02HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback