ID H0212 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2019 Session Law Chapter 134 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPARTMENT OF JUVENILE CORRECTIONS -- Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Juvenile Corrections for fiscal year 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Juvenile Corrections for fiscal year 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2019 Session Law Chapter 134 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-21HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 20, 2019
2019-03-20HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-19SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-19SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-18HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-15HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-14Senateto House
2019-03-14SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-14SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-03-13SenateRetained on calendar
2019-03-12SenateRetained on calendar
2019-03-06SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-05SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2019-03-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-04Houseto Senate
2019-03-04HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-04HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3
2019-03-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-28HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback