ID H0211 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the market value of a residential property on appeal by a taxpayer.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the market value of a residential property on appeal by a taxpayer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-02-26 | House | to Senate |
2021-02-26 | House | Title apvd |
2021-02-26 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 62-6-2 |
2021-02-26 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-02-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-02-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-02-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |