ID H0210 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 229 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 229 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and adds to existing law relating to the right to farm to define a term and to revise definitions; to revise provisions providing that a certain operation, facility and expansion are not a nuisance and to revise provisions relating to an exception; to revise provisions relating to local ordinances; to provide provisions relating to nuisance actions; and to provide for severability.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law relating to the right to farm to define a term and to revise definitions; to revise provisions providing that a certain operation, facility and expansion are not a nuisance and to revise provisions relating to an exception; to revise provisions relating to local ordinances; to provide provisions relating to nuisance actions; and to provide for severability.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 229 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-06 | Delivered to Governor on 04/05 | |
2011-04-05 | To Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-04 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-04 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-01 | To enrol | |
2011-03-31 | to House | |
2011-03-31 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-31 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 32-2-1 | |
2011-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-11 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-03-11 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-11 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-10 | to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-10 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 57-11-2 | |
2011-03-04 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-04 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-03 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-03 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-03 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-02 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-03-02 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-01 | to printing | |
2011-03-01 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-01 | House intro |