ID H0209 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2017 Session Law Chapter 192 Effective: 10/01/2018 SECTION 5-7; 07/01/2019 Section 51-122 (within SECTION 3); 07/01/2017 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2017 Session Law Chapter 192 Effective: 10/01/2018 SECTION 5-7; 07/01/2019 Section 51-122 (within SECTION 3); 07/01/2017 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
NOTARIAL ACTS -- Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to establish the Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts.
Title
Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to establish the Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2017 Session Law Chapter 192 Effective: 10/01/2018 SECTION 5-7; 07/01/2019 Section 51-122 (within SECTION 3); 07/01/2017 all other SECTIONS |
2017-03-23 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 22, 2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-17 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-06 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2017-03-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-24 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |