ID H0208 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2019 Session Law Chapter 274 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

IDAHO TRANSPORTATION DEPARTMENT -- Amends existing law to remove provisions regarding railroad crossings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to remove provisions regarding railroad crossings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2019 Session Law Chapter 274 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-04-02HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:10 a.m. on April 1, 2019
2019-04-01HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-29SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-29SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-28HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-27HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-26Senateto House
2019-03-26SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-26SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-03-20SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-11SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
2019-03-11SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-08Houseto Senate
2019-03-08HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-08HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-2-3
2019-03-07HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-05HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-28HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback