ID H0206 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2019 Session Law Chapter 273 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CONCEALED WEAPONS -- Amends existing law to revise certain exceptions regarding the carrying or possession of a concealed handgun.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise certain exceptions regarding the carrying or possession of a concealed handgun.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2019 Session Law Chapter 273 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-04-02HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on April 2, 2019
2019-04-02HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-04-01SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-04-01SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-29HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-28HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-27Senateto House
2019-03-27SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-27SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 28-7-0
2019-03-26SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-25SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-15SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2019-03-15SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-14Houseto Senate
2019-03-14HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-14HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 53-14-3
2019-03-13HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-11HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Wednesday, March 13, 2019
2019-03-08HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-07HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-05HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-26HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback