ID H0204 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PROPERTY -- Amends existing law to revise the definition of “personal property.”

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise the definition of “personal property.”

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2019-03-11SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-08Houseto Senate
2019-03-08HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-08HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 58-9-3
2019-03-07HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-05HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-26HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback