ID H0204 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY -- Amends existing law to revise the definition of “personal property.”
Title
Amends existing law to revise the definition of “personal property.”
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-03-08 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-08 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 58-9-3 |
2019-03-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-26 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |