ID H0203 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 146 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SECRETARY OF STATE -- Amends and adds to existing law to authorize the Secretary of State to create a statewide electronic filing system and to provide that public disclosure of certain personal information of users of the system shall be exempt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to authorize the Secretary of State to create a statewide electronic filing system and to provide that public disclosure of certain personal information of users of the system shall be exempt.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 146 Effective: 07/01/2017
2017-03-22HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:50 a.m. on March 21, 2017
2017-03-21HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2017-03-20SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2017-03-20SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2017-03-16HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2017-03-15HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2017-03-14Senateto House
2017-03-14SenateTitle apvd
2017-03-14SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2017-03-09SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-03-08SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-03-03SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2017-03-03SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2017-03-02Houseto Senate
2017-03-02HouseTitle apvd
2017-03-02HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2
2017-03-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-02-28HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-02-24HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2017-02-23HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback