ID H0202 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

TAX COMMISSION -- Amends existing law to provide that certain actions of the State Tax Commission and the State Board of Equalization may be governed by the Idaho Administrative Procedure Act, and to provide for standards of appeal to the district court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that certain actions of the State Tax Commission and the State Board of Equalization may be governed by the Idaho Administrative Procedure Act, and to provide for standards of appeal to the district court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2019-03-21SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-20Houseto Senate
2019-03-20HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-20HouseRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 67-1-2
2019-03-19HouseRead second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-18HouseRead first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
2019-03-18HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2019-03-15HouseBill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2019-03-15HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2019-03-15HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2019-03-15HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-12HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2019-02-26HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback