ID H0201 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2019 Session Law Chapter 205 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PROPERTY TAX LEVIES -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide that certain nonschool taxing districts may certify a budget request to fund a judicially confirmed obligation under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide that certain nonschool taxing districts may certify a budget request to fund a judicially confirmed obligation under certain conditions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2019 Session Law Chapter 205 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2019
2019-03-26HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 25, 2019
2019-03-25HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-21HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-20HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-19Senateto House
2019-03-19SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-19SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 27-7-1
2019-03-14SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-13SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2019-03-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-04Houseto Senate
2019-03-04HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-04HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 37-29-4
2019-03-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-28HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-26HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback