ID H0199 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2019 Session Law Chapter 272 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2019 Session Law Chapter 272 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CONCEALED WEAPONS -- Amends existing law to revise the definition of “deadly weapon” and to revise provisions regarding the carrying of concealed weapons.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the definition of “deadly weapon” and to revise provisions regarding the carrying of concealed weapons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2019 Session Law Chapter 272 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:10 a.m. on April 1, 2019 |
2019-04-01 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2019-03-26 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-20 | House | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 68-0-2 |
2019-03-19 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-18 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2019-03-15 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-13 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2019-03-12 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-11 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-08 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-26 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |