ID H0196 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - U.C. to be returned to Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

NATUROPATHIC MEDICINE -- Establishes provisions regarding the licensure of naturopathic physicians.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions regarding the licensure of naturopathic physicians.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseU.C. to be returned to Health & Welfare Committee
2019-03-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-04HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-28HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-26HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2019-02-25HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback