ID H0195 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

TARGETED PICKETING -- Adds to existing law to prohibit targeted picketing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to prohibit targeted picketing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2021-03-09HouseFAILED 31-38-1
2021-03-09HouseFAILED
2021-03-09HouseMotion to Lay on the Table
2021-03-09HouseRules Suspended: Ayes 66 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 4, read in full as required
2021-03-09HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-03-08HouseReported out of Committee without Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-03-02HouseMotion to return to Judiciary, Rules & Administration Committee; return to committee
2021-03-02HouseU.C. to return to Judiciary, Rules & Administration Committee; objection; Remain on General Orders
2021-02-26HouseU.C. to be placed on General Orders, no objection
2021-02-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-02-24HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-02-23HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-02-22HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-02-17HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback