ID H0195 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
Pending: Senate Commerce and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

BARBER AND COSMETOLOGY SERVICES -- Amends existing law to provide that a barber or cosmetology school may retroactively reinstate a license that has lapsed due to a missed licensure payment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that a barber or cosmetology school may retroactively reinstate a license that has lapsed due to a missed licensure payment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
2019-03-11SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-08Houseto Senate
2019-03-08HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-08HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-0-4
2019-03-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-06HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-25HouseReported Printed and Referred to Business
2019-02-22HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback