ID H0194 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2019 Session Law Chapter 313 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

PUBLIC LIBRARIES -- Amends existing law to provide that a public library's Internet safety policy shall apply to any publicly accessible wireless Internet access provided by the library.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that a public library's Internet safety policy shall apply to any publicly accessible wireless Internet access provided by the library.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2019 Session Law Chapter 313 Effective: 07/01/2020
2019-04-05HouseDelivered to Governor at 1:50 p.m. on April 4, 2019
2019-04-04HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-04-04SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-04-04SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-04-03HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-04-02Houseto enrol
2019-04-02HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-02HouseRead third time in full as amended in Senate -- PASSED 63-5-2
2019-04-01HouseRead second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-29HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-29HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2019-03-28HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2019-03-28HouseHouse Concurred in Senate Amendments
2019-03-28HouseReported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Education for concurrence recommendation
2019-03-27HouseReturned from the Senate Amended
2019-03-26Senateto House
2019-03-26SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-26SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 25-10-0
2019-03-22SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2019-03-21SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-21SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-03-21SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2019-03-21SenateAmendments ordered printed
2019-03-21SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-19SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Education
2019-03-07SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-06Houseto Senate
2019-03-06HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-06HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-3-0
2019-03-05HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-04HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-25HouseReported Printed and Referred to Education
2019-02-22HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback