ID H0194 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 226 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 226 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the sunset clause for the sales and use tax rebate for tangible personal property used directly by a media production company in a media production event to July 1, 2016.
Title
Amends the sunset clause for the sales and use tax rebate for tangible personal property used directly by a media production company in a media production event to July 1, 2016.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 226 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-06 | Delivered to Governor on 04/05 | |
2011-04-05 | To Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-04 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-04 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-01 | To enrol | |
2011-03-31 | to House | |
2011-03-31 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-31 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 27-7-1 | |
2011-03-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-23 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-08 | to Loc Gov | |
2011-03-08 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-08 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-07 | to Senate | |
2011-03-07 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-07 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 50-16-4 | |
2011-03-03 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-03 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-02 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-02 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-02 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-25 | to Rev/Tax | |
2011-02-25 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-24 | to printing | |
2011-02-24 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-24 | House intro |