ID H0193 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CHILD SUPPORT -- Amends existing law to provide that a lien for child support delinquency attaches to certain property and to provide for calculation of a self-employed parent's financial resources for purposes of determining child support.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a lien for child support delinquency attaches to certain property and to provide for calculation of a self-employed parent's financial resources for purposes of determining child support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-03-01 | House | to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Title apvd |
2021-03-01 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 36-33-1 |
2021-03-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-02-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-24 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |