ID H0193 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2019 Session Law Chapter 271 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

STATE TAX COMMISSION -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding legal descriptions and boundaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding legal descriptions and boundaries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2019 Session Law Chapter 271 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-04-02HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on April 2, 2019
2019-04-02HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-04-01SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-04-01SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-29HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-28HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-27Senateto House
2019-03-27SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-27SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 31-4-0
2019-03-26SenateRetained on calendar
2019-03-25SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-22SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2019-03-13SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-12Houseto Senate
2019-03-12HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-12HouseRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 69-0-1
2019-03-11HouseRead second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-08HouseRead first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
2019-03-08HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2019-03-07HouseBill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2019-03-07HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2019-03-07HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2019-02-27HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2019-02-25HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2019-02-22HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback