ID H0189 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2019 Session Law Chapter 270 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

FISH AND GAME -- Repeals existing law relating to the authority of officers to conduct certain searches.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals existing law relating to the authority of officers to conduct certain searches.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2019 Session Law Chapter 270 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-04-02HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:10 a.m. on April 1, 2019
2019-04-01HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-29SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-29SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-28HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-27HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-26Senateto House
2019-03-26SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-26SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-03-25SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-22SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
2019-03-21SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-20Houseto Senate
2019-03-20HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-20HouseRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 68-0-2
2019-03-19HouseRead second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-18HouseRead first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
2019-03-18HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2019-03-15HouseBill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2019-03-15HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2019-03-15HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2019-03-15HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-07HouseRetained on General Orders
2019-02-27HouseRetained on General Orders
2019-02-26HouseU.C. to be placed on General Orders
2019-02-26HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-25HouseReported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation
2019-02-22HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback