ID H0182 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 21, 2019 Session Law Chapter 141 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PHARMACISTS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding products that may be prescribed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding products that may be prescribed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 21, 2019 Session Law Chapter 141 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:10 a.m. on March 18, 2019
2019-03-18HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-15SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-15SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-14HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-13HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-12Senateto House
2019-03-12SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-12SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2019-03-07SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-06SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2019-03-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-04Houseto Senate
2019-03-04HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-04HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-0-4
2019-03-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-28HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-22HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2019-02-21HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback