ID H0178 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HOMICIDE -- Adds to existing law to provide that a person who commits certain actions involving heroin shall be guilty of second-degree murder.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that a person who commits certain actions involving heroin shall be guilty of second-degree murder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2017-03-02 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 26-43-1 |
2017-03-01 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-28 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |