ID H0177 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2019 Session Law Chapter 202 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2019 Session Law Chapter 202 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PERSI -- Amends existing law to provide for the reemployment of certain public safety officers.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for the reemployment of certain public safety officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2019 Session Law Chapter 202 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 25, 2019 |
2019-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2019-03-19 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-03-04 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-04 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3 |
2019-03-01 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-22 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |