ID H0174 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2019 Session Law Chapter 69 Effective: 03/12/219
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- HEALTH EDUCATION PROGRAMS -- Relates to the appropriation to the State Board of Education and the Board of Regents of the University of Idaho for Health Education Programs for fiscal year 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the State Board of Education and the Board of Regents of the University of Idaho for Health Education Programs for fiscal year 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2019 Session Law Chapter 69 Effective: 03/12/219
2019-03-13HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:40 a.m. on March 12, 2019
2019-03-12HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-11SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-11SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-08HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-06Senateto House
2019-03-06SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-06SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 -Engelking
2019-03-01SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-28SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2019-02-27SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-26Houseto Senate
2019-02-26HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-26HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2019-02-25HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-22HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-21HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback