ID H0171 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 3, 2013 Session Law Chapter 264 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 3, 2013 Session Law Chapter 264 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide that the county or highway district have actual notice of an encroachment that is unsafe for pedestrians or motorists, to establish provisions relating to certain persons controlling an encroachment, to provide for the standard of care for the county or highway districts, to provide that the county or highway district shall not be liable for any injury or damage caused by an encroachment or failure to remove the unauthorized encroachment upon a highway and to establish provisions relating to any defense the county or highway district may assert in a civil action.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that the county or highway district have actual notice of an encroachment that is unsafe for pedestrians or motorists, to establish provisions relating to certain persons controlling an encroachment, to provide for the standard of care for the county or highway districts, to provide that the county or highway district shall not be liable for any injury or damage caused by an encroachment or failure to remove the unauthorized encroachment upon a highway and to establish provisions relating to any defense the county or highway district may assert in a civil action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 3, 2013 Session Law Chapter 264 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-04-01 | House | Delivered to Governor at 8:30 a.m. on March 29, 2013 |
2013-03-29 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-27 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-03-26 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-26 | Senate | PASSED -- 30-3-2 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-03-11 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-11 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-11 | House | PASSED -- 54-13-3 |
2013-03-11 | House | Read third time in full as amended |
2013-03-07 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2013-03-05 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2013-03-05 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2013-03-05 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-01 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2013-02-28 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-27 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2013-02-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |