ID H0162 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred to Resources & Environment
Pending: Senate Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FEDERAL LANDS -- Adds to existing law to provide for the Idaho Council on Federal Lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide for the Idaho Council on Federal Lands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Resources & Environment
2019-03-11SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
2019-02-27SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-26Houseto Senate
2019-02-26HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-26HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 55-15-0
2019-02-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-22HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-15HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback