ID H0161 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PURCHASING BY POLITICAL SUBDIVISIONS -- Amends existing law to provide for the posting of notice for solicitations of information technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for the posting of notice for solicitations of information technology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2019-02-25SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-22Houseto Senate
2019-02-22HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-22HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 44-26-0
2019-02-21HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-20HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-19HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-15HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback