ID H0158 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2019 Session Law Chapter 199 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATIONS -- Amends existing law to provide for certain prohibited conduct by homeowner's associations regarding solar panels, to provide that a homeowner's association may adopt certain rules, and to provide an exception.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for certain prohibited conduct by homeowner's associations regarding solar panels, to provide that a homeowner's association may adopt certain rules, and to provide an exception.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2019 Session Law Chapter 199 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-20HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 19, 2019
2019-03-19HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-18SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-18SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-15HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-14HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-13Senateto House
2019-03-13SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-13SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-03-12SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-11SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2019-03-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-04Houseto Senate
2019-03-04HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-04HouseRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 55-13-2
2019-03-01HouseRead second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-28HouseRead first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
2019-02-28HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2019-02-27HouseBill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2019-02-27HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2019-02-27HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2019-02-27HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2019-02-20HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2019-02-18HouseReferred to Business
2019-02-18HouseReported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral
2019-02-15HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback