ID H0157 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HIGHWAY DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNT -- Amends existing law to revise apportionment in the Highway Distribution Account.
Title
Amends existing law to revise apportionment in the Highway Distribution Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2017-02-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 33-37-0 |
2017-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-02-17 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 20, 2017 |
2017-02-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |