ID H0156 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 13, 2019 Session Law Chapter 80 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FIREARMS -- Amends existing law to revise the definition of a “qualified retired law enforcement officer.”

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise the definition of a “qualified retired law enforcement officer.”

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 13, 2019 Session Law Chapter 80 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-14HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 13, 2019
2019-03-13HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-12SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-12SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-11HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-08HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-07Senateto House
2019-03-07SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-07SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-03-04SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-01SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2019-02-21SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-20Houseto Senate
2019-02-20HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-20HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2019-02-19HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-18HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-15HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-14HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback