ID H0154 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Reported out of Committee and referred to: Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Reported out of Committee and referred to: Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
VEHICLE INSPECTION AND MAINTENANCE -- Amends existing law to provide that certain counties may opt out of vehicle inspection and maintenance programs under specified conditions.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that certain counties may opt out of vehicle inspection and maintenance programs under specified conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported out of Committee and referred to: Transportation |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-02-26 | House | to Senate |
2021-02-26 | House | Title apvd |
2021-02-26 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 51-17-2 |
2021-02-26 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-02-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-02-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-02-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |