ID H0150 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to provide that early voting shall begin during a certain time period before the election.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that early voting shall begin during a certain time period before the election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-02-24 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-24 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 45-24-1 |
2017-02-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-02-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-02-22 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-02-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |