ID H0146 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - U.C. to be returned to Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RECORDER'S FEES -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the fees a county recorder may receive.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the fees a county recorder may receive.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseU.C. to be returned to Business Committee
2019-02-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-26HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-22HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-13HouseReported Printed and Referred to Business
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback