ID H0145 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
Pending: Senate Commerce and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

SELF-SERVICE STORAGE FACILITIES -- Amends and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding rental agreements and liens, to provide for a procedure in the event of default where the property stored in the leased space is a vehicle or trailer, and to provide for when an operator may restrict access to the leased space.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding rental agreements and liens, to provide for a procedure in the event of default where the property stored in the leased space is a vehicle or trailer, and to provide for when an operator may restrict access to the leased space.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
2019-03-06SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-05Houseto Senate
2019-03-05HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-05HouseRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 50-20-0
2019-03-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-01HouseRead second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-28HouseRead first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
2019-02-28HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2019-02-27HouseBill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2019-02-27HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2019-02-27HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2019-02-27HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2019-02-26HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2019-02-13HouseReported Printed and Referred to Business
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback