ID H0145 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 158 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 158 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to recreational activities to revise definitions.
Title
Amends existing law relating to recreational activities to revise definitions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 158 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-31 | Delivered to Governor on 03/30 | |
2011-03-30 | To Governor | |
2011-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-28 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-28 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-25 | To enrol | |
2011-03-24 | to House | |
2011-03-24 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-24 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-03-17 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-16 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-07 | to Transp | |
2011-03-07 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-07 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-04 | to Senate | |
2011-03-04 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-04 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 67-0-3 | |
2011-02-28 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2011-02-28 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-25 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2011-02-25 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-25 | Rpt engros | |
2011-02-24 | to engros | |
2011-02-24 | Rpt out amen | |
2011-02-17 | to Gen Ord | |
2011-02-17 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-14 | to Transp | |
2011-02-14 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-11 | to printing | |
2011-02-11 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-11 | House intro |