ID H0141 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2019 Session Law Chapter 226 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MINES -- Amends existing law to revise references to mining operations and to provide for financial assurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise references to mining operations and to provide for financial assurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2019 Session Law Chapter 226 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-26HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 25, 2019
2019-03-25HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-21HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-20HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-19Senateto House
2019-03-19SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-19SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 29-3-3
2019-03-14SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-13SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-01SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
2019-03-01SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-28Houseto Senate
2019-02-28HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-28HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 59-11-0
2019-02-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-25HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-22HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-13HouseReported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback