ID H0139 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 3, 2019 Session Law Chapter 293 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FOREIGN DEFAMATION JUDGMENTS -- Adds to existing law to provide for foreign defamation judgments and to provide procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide for foreign defamation judgments and to provide procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 3, 2019 Session Law Chapter 293 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-04-02HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on April 2, 2019
2019-04-02HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-04-01SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-04-01SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-29HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-28HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-27Senateto House
2019-03-27SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-27SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 32-3-0
2019-03-26SenateRetained on calendar
2019-03-20SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-19SenateReported out without amendments; filed for second reading
2019-03-18SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-03-04SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2019-03-04SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-01Houseto Senate
2019-03-01HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-01HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 60-4-6
2019-02-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-26HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-13HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback