ID H0137 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - April 11, 2017 Session Law Chapter 325 Effective: 04/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - April 11, 2017 Session Law Chapter 325 Effective: 04/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTRICIANS -- Amends existing law to revise a certain exemption regarding property owners.
Title
Amends existing law to revise a certain exemption regarding property owners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | April 11, 2017 Session Law Chapter 325 Effective: 04/06/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Law without signature |
2017-03-28 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:25 a.m. on March 27, 2017 |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-21 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-14 | House | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 65-5-0 |
2017-03-13 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-10 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-06 | House | U.C. to be returned to Business Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2017-03-02 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2017-03-02 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-24 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2017-02-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |