ID H0136 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 17, 2021 Session Law Chapter 70 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ELECTIONS -- Adds to existing law to provide for at-large elections in certain political subdivisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide for at-large elections in certain political subdivisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 17, 2021 Session Law Chapter 70 Effective: 07/01/2021
2021-03-17HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:50 a.m. on March 16, 2021
2021-03-16HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2021-03-15SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2021-03-15SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2021-03-15HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2021-03-12HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2021-03-11Senateto House
2021-03-11SenateTitle apvd
2021-03-11SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2021-03-04SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-03-03SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-02-26SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2021-02-26SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2021-02-25Houseto Senate
2021-02-25HouseTitle apvd
2021-02-25HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 65-1-4
2021-02-25HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-02-24HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-02-23HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-02-15HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2021-02-12HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback